THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 5:41:58 AM
Gardhouse, Amanda Isabel
CPSO#:
92896
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Ave
Unit 104
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
Phone: 705-329-3649
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA ISABEL GARDHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDHOUSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2014 |