THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:32:19 PM
Boulos, Emily Bridget
CPSO#:
92891
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Claydon, Emily Bridget (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Breast Imaging Department, 3rd fl
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2C1
Phone: 1-416-946-2000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY BRIDGET BOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2018 |