THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:23:09 AM
Vanderveen, Jessica Anne
CPSO#:
92879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamiton Program for Schizophrenia
20 Hughson Street South
Suite 405
Hamilton ON L8N 2A1
Phone: (905) 525-2832
Fax: 905-546-0055
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE VANDERVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERVEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2016 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2016 |