THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:01:07 PM
Grice, Allison Jean
CPSO#:
92834
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Saunders, Allison Jean (used until: 07 Jan 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main St E, Grimsby, ON
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Phone: (905)945-2253
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Mar 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLISON JEAN GRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRICE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2013 |