THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:07:54 AM
Sanaee, Layli Solmaz
CPSO#:
92833
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
R Fraser Elliott Building
Ground Floor Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAYLI SOLMAZ SANAEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANAEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |