THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:40:00 PM
Mehdizadeh Hakak, Hamid
CPSO#:
92810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Kidz Clinic
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Phone: 905 303 0304.
Fax: 905 303 3035
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMID MEHDIZADEH HAKAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDIZADEH HAKAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2023 |