THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:56:21 AM
Ramonas, Milita
CPSO#:
92785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MILITA RAMONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMONAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 28 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 28 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2016 |