THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:00:05 PM
Eardley, William Andrew
CPSO#:
92771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
130-2124 Bowen Rd
Nanaimo BC V9S 1H7
Phone: 250-758-0060
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANDREW EARDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EARDLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 11 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2023 |