THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:44 AM
Luong, Me-Linh
CPSO#:
92715
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 May 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |