THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:28:18 AM
Jeschke, Marc Gerhard
CPSO#:
92713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
David Braley Research Institute
C5-104
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:15 Jul 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |