THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:15:13 PM
Wassef, Anthony Wafik Aziz
CPSO#:
92703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252 Ext. 223
Fax: 519-741-5772
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY WAFIK AZIZ WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 May 2010 to 04 Jun 2010
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2014 |