THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:56:56 AM
Asfour, Nabil Ahmad
CPSO#:
92679
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2301 Tecumseh Road East #140
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
Phone: (226) 221-9295
Fax: (226) 221-9049
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NABIL AHMAD ASFOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASFOUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 May 2010 to 28 May 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |