THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:27:50 AM
Al Mutawa, Fatimah Hussain
CPSO#:
92675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 c0mmissioner Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:16 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATIMAH HUSSAIN AL MUTAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MUTAWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |