THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:21:18 PM
Suryanarayan, Deepa
CPSO#:
92674
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam
Education: Mysore University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:18 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 26 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 10 May 2010 to 30 May 2010
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 14 Jan 2013 to 03 Feb 2013
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |