THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:15:36 PM
Mansukhani, Tarun Ram
CPSO#:
92669
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Grace University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: (416) 299-1322
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2016 |
|
Active |