THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:45:10 AM
Chih, Sharon Shiaw Yun
CPSO#:
92667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The University of Western Australia Facu, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-1295
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7327
Fax: (613) 696-7359
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:17 Jun 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jan 2012
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2021 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2022 |
|
Active |