THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:25:30 PM
Masood, Syed Faraz
CPSO#:
92663
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203-4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6A6
Phone: (905) 3573988
Fax: 9053570968
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Apr 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
|
Active |