THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:31:03 PM
Kirupananthan, Shamini
CPSO#:
92652
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management at: 1-800 -775-0093, info@ recordsregistry.ca, www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 21 Aug 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAMINI KIRUPANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRUPANANTHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Apr 2010 to 14 May 2010
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2017 |