THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:42:24 AM
Schindler, Nathalie Laura
CPSO#:
92647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-5020
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE LAURA SCHINDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHINDLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 16 Apr 2010 to 07 May 2010
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
EL - General Surgery
McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2014 |