THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:53:14 PM
Kyskan, Robert
CPSO#:
92634
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:07 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2013 to 21 Jun 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |