THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:24:37 AM
Arya, Neehar
CPSO#:
92633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue Room D1 08
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2010 to 12 Apr 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2021 |
|
Active |