THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:37:02 PM
Jones, Janelle Elizabeth
CPSO#:
92632
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2014 |