THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:05:45 PM
Tadwalkar, Sayali
CPSO#:
92590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Marathi
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
PO Box 399
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: 807 229-2672
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAYALI TADWALKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADWALKAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
EL - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |