THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:32:41 AM
Gedye, Craig Alastair
CPSO#:
92589
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 09 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 10 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2014 |