THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:36:48 AM
Qureshi, Mosarrat Jabin
CPSO#:
92585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: Rajshahi Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2217
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Qureshi at:
Northern Alberta Neonatal Program
Royal Alexandra Hospital Site
Dtc 5027
10240 Kingsway
Edmonton, Alberta
T5H 3V9
Tel: (780) 735-4670
Fax: (780) 735-4072
Date Received: 08 Dec 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOSARRAT JABIN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |