THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:09:13 PM
Ullah, Saif
CPSO#:
92580
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3-8279 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON L2H 1H5
Phone: 2892966397
Fax: 2893021020
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Feb 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAIF ULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 22 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)