THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:29:13 AM
Bajaj, Harminder Pal Singh
CPSO#:
92566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Government Medical College, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 497-8558
Fax: 905-497-8559
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
|
Active |