THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:52:22 AM
Moore, Jennifer Dorothy
CPSO#:
92551
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Loyola University of Chicago, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Palliative Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:10 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
|
Active |