THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:08:51 AM
Mathew, Sajida
CPSO#:
92542
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2019 |