THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 11:05:04 AM
Smith, David Richard
CPSO#:
92538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Columbia University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Mar 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2012 |
|
Active |