THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:20:10 AM
Babakkor, Mohammed Ahmed Omar
CPSO#:
92537
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2014 to 27 Nov 2014
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |