THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:27:55 AM
Lee, Kyoung Ho
CPSO#:
92531
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Seoul National University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Apr 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2010 |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2011 |