THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:11:45 AM
Ansari, Ali Hashsham
CPSO#:
92501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Doctors Urgent Care Family Medicine
15 - 1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Apr 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI HASHSHAM ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |