THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:19:41 AM
Rokach, Binyamin
CPSO#:
92486
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BINYAMIN ROKACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROKACH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2010 to 14 Mar 2010
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2014 |