THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:50:55 AM
El-Zein, Mohamad Abdul Karim
CPSO#:
92479
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
05 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of Beirut, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Lebanon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 22 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Aug 2012 to 05 Nov 2012
PEAP - CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Nov 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2015 |