THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:37:20 PM
Kelkile, Teshome Shibre
CPSO#:
92475
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2014 |