THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:53:43 PM
Talsky, Mark Aaron
CPSO#:
92458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
130-11910 111 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T5G 0E5
Phone: (780) 453-3757
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK AARON TALSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2010 to 14 May 2010
EL - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 16 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2019 |