THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:45:21 AM
Struthers, Colin Nuttall
CPSO#:
92427
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON K8N 2Y3
Phone: (613) 779-9699
Fax: (613) 779-9689
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN NUTTALL STRUTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUTHERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2010 to 09 Feb 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 27 Apr 2013
EL - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 28 Apr 2013 to 17 May 2013
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)