THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:31:29 PM
Yatsynovich, Viktor
CPSO#:
92412
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yatsynovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |
|
Active |