THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:44:43 PM
Hiscox, Christina Mary Ann
CPSO#:
92407
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2010 to 05 Feb 2010
EL - Plastic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 2013 |