THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:29:38 AM
Shuffield, James Walter
CPSO#:
92401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of North Texas at Fort Worth (TCOM), 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
271 Frances St
Box 188
Wingham ON N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3915
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Shuffield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 28 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2023 |