THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:32:06 AM
Postl, Lara Anne
CPSO#:
92392
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
1611 Montreal Rd.
Ottawa ON K1H 8M3
Phone: 613-7386990 Ext. 244
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARA ANNE POSTL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSTL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2012 |