THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:33:23 PM
Akhtar, Nadeem
CPSO#:
92377
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of London, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123 James St N
Hamilton Family Health Team
Hamilton ON L8R 2K8
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Nov 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2019 |
|
Active |