THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:19:07 PM
Vincent, Ajoy
CPSO#:
92365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Calicut University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8942
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |