THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:47:48 AM
Torlakovic, Emina
CPSO#:
92360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Pathology Room 2845
103 Hospital Dr
Saskatoon SK S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1633
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Goran Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. Emina Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:05 Jan 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
|
Active |