THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:35:47 AM
Moodley, Prabashnee
CPSO#:
92351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alton Village Medical Clinic
Unit 5
4631 Palladium Way
Burlington
Burlington ON L7M 0W9
Phone: (905) 319-9299
Fax: (289) 427-5167
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRABASHNEE MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2012 |