THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:31:35 AM
McCarty, David
CPSO#:
92349
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
408 Bradwell Chase
London ON N6G 0P7
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Malawi
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Sep 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2023 |