THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:23:16 AM
Midha, Vishal Manohar
CPSO#:
92346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Shivaji University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
444 Plumas Blvd
Yuba City CA 95991
United States
Phone: (530) 749-3420
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Midha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Feb 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jan 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |
|
Active |