THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:41:16 PM
Bukhari, Nedal Ahmed M
CPSO#:
92343
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MPR7+4CQ Makkah Al Mukarramah Rd
Prince Sultan Military Medical City
Riyadh 12233
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966114777714
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEDAL AHMED M BUKHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKHARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 01 Mar 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Mar 2011 to 24 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Mar 2012 to 24 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2019 |