THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:35:08 AM
Mc Auliffe, Niamh Ann
CPSO#:
92340
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 24 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2019 |